Financial history THE WEMBLEY TO SOWETO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £43.77k £45.34k £26.93k £560 £0
Total expenditure £31.98k £34.16k £25.05k £3.98k £2.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A