Trustees REFUGEE AND MIGRANT FORUM OF ESSEX AND LONDON (RAMFEL)
Charity number: 1155207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fatima Sulaiman | Chair | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marcos Paul Cuevas-Nunez | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lea Ghanem | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barialai Barakzai | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatosin Kuforiji | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felix Rehren | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Francis James Webster | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rashmi Mukherjee | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Warr | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.