BUXTON WELL DRESSING FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserve and promote the historical tradition of a Well Dressing Festival
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 15 April 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD WILLIAM LOWER | Chair | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Linda Grooby | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Aneta Mosley | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Florence Barker | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Robert Gilson | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN GILSON | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE GOULD | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID MOSS | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.85k | £1.86k | £17.24k | £18.26k | £20.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.09k | £4.87k | £16.69k | £15.89k | £17.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BUXTON, DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) PRESERVING AND PROMOTING THE HISTORICAL TRADITION OF A WELL DRESSING FESTIVAL AND (2) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORICAL TRADITION AND CRAFT OF WELL DRESSING, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, EXHIBITIONS AND DEMONSTRATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Lansdowne Road
Buxton
SK17 6RR
- Phone:
- 0129873448
- Email:
- richard.lower2@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window