ROCK FIRE RAIN

Charity number: 1157735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 12 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 03 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 24 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2016 13 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 Not Required