COMMUNITY FOREST LAND TRUST

Charity Number: 1155979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charitable activitis are those of the enhancement and improvement, maintenance and protection of the environment and landscape within the North West, for the benefit of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £456
Total expenditure: £3,085

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • St Helens

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL ANTHONY NOLAN BSC MSC Chair 27 January 2014
MERSEY FOREST FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Roger Pearson Trustee 14 October 2022
MERSEY FOREST FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAVID SHAW Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
David McAleavy Trustee 01 October 2019
MERSEY FOREST FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £23.82k £426 £5 £5.73k £456
Total expenditure £11.61k £8.03k £3.74k £2.29k £3.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 11 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 TWISS GREEN DRIVE
CULCHETH
WARRINGTON
WA3 4HY
Phone:
01925816217
Website:

No information available