ST MARY'S INDEPENDENT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1155647
Charity reporting is overdue by 482 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 482 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 482 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 11 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 May 2017 On time Download