ST MARY'S INDEPENDENT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1155647
Charity reporting is overdue by 448 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £1.12m £2.11m £2.53m £2.12m £2.43m
Total expenditure £897.18k £1.92m £2.12m £2.15m £2.43m
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £72.88k £69.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £181.47k £402.29k £8.32k £169.19k
Income - Other trading activities £155.56k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £937.48k £1.87m £2.12m £2.12m £2.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £26.26k £57.33k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £885.43k £1.89m £2.10m £2.09m £2.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £21.94k £54.65k £43.79k
Expenditure - Governance £6.64k £6.11k £0 £5.60k £6.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.63k