CLARETS IN THE COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1155856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 20 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 07 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 27 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 15 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 15 February 2017 On time Download