DANICA'S DREAM FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rugby match. Sky Dive ,concert
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Cumbria
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 05 March 2014: Standard registration
- DDF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MAXWELL | Chair | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALLISON MARY MAXWELL | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARK ANDREWS | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|||||
MICHELLE CORKHILL | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANICE SHEPHERD | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.51k | £23.53k | £13.35k | £12.06k | £9.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.63k | £13.04k | £5.53k | £5.56k | £4.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 16 November 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS UP TO THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE BEING TREATED FOR A CANCER RELATED ILLNESS WITHIN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Copeland Avenue
Egremont
CA22 2QT
- Phone:
- 01946825277
- Email:
- jmaxwell123@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window