SHROPSHIRE LANGUAGES SOCIETY


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 14 May 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer language learning for the less fortunate and we promote from an academic, professional and social perspective providing essential resources and services not provided by the state. We also raise cultural awareness, promote multiculturalism and strive to eliminate barriers to learning and provide learning to those who otherwise would be unable to access language teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 10 July 2014: CIO registration
- SLS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELAINE MARGARET KNOWLES | Chair | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Helen Julia Stokes | Trustee | 12 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Lyudmyla Nod | Trustee | 11 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/12/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.46k | £6.58k | £2.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.16k | £5.41k | £561 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1125 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1125 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1490 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1490 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND ENRICH THE LEARNING OF FOREIGN LANGUAGES FROM AN ACADEMIC, PROFESSIONAL AND SOCIAL PERSPECTIVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIGHTMAN CHAMBERS
Quantum House
14-14a The Square
SHREWSBURY
SY1 1LH
- Phone:
- 07375 640305
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window