MANGOTSFIELD OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity benefits the parents/guardians of primary school children at three schools by providing daily care, recreation and education for primary school children during out of school hours and school holidays. The wrap around care offered by each school as a result of our provision enables parents/carers to work beyond school hours, including extra sessions being facilitated when required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 31 October 2014: Standard registration
- 03 July 2024: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
- MOOSC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £343.87k | £275.00k | £277.72k | £326.71k | £349.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £326.41k | £287.86k | £287.22k | £302.01k | £366.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.66k | £9.89k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/08/2014 ADOPTED 09/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE GROUP SHALL BE (A)TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS(B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window