BLEDINGTON AND FOSCOT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1155942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.17k £3.08k £30.18k £34.82k £10.51k
Total expenditure £32 £31 £127 £63.03k £2.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A