IDOLRICH THEATRE ROTTO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Travelling puppet theatre which visits children's and elderly people's residential homes in the community and doing workshops to enable audience participation. Our activities that carried out all over the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 2014: CIO registration
- IDOLRICH (Previous name)
- IDOLRICH COMMUNITY THEATRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dan Scott | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Oswin | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hojlund | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pat Scott | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
GINA FEITELSON | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAYA EVANS | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ALTARAS | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.33k | £13.89k | £20.32k | £17.94k | £10.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.30k | £12.95k | £16.89k | £20.13k | £12.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 383 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 383 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 12 October 2022 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 12 October 2022 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC LIVING IN EAST SUSSEX, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF PUPPET SHOW, WORKSHOPS, EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY PUPPETRY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Lower Park Road
Hastings
TN34 2LB
- Phone:
- 01424203944
- Email:
- info@theatrerotto.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window