EXPERT IMPACT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Expert Impact facilitates a 'Human Lending Library' through which entrepreneurs can 'borrow' successful entrepreneurs to help them solve their challenges and grow. Founders of ventures in our target sectors apply for hour-long sessions with our Experts. We screen applicants matching them with the appropriate Expert best suited to advise them. Some social organisations receive deeper support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 May 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Joanne Allen | Chair | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sabira Kanji | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Downie | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.00k | £276.51k | £76.25k | £86.52k | £8.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.48k | £202.59k | £164.28k | £140.60k | £48.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/05/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: (A) PROMOTE INDUSTRY, COMMERCE AND ENTERPRISE WHICH (I) RELIEVES UNEMPLOYMENT; (II) RELIEVES POVERTY; IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELDS OF BUSINESS, MANAGEMENT AND GOOD GOVERNANCE BY PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, SEMINARS AND TUTORIALS TO, AND THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AMONG, THOSE IN THE BUSINESS COMMUNITY AND BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND GUIDANCE TO THOSE SEEKING TO SET UP NEW BUSINESSES OR EXPAND EXISTING BUSINESSES; (B) PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES, THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES AND TO ENCOURAGE SOCIAL INVESTMENT, IN PARTICULAR BY ACTING AS AN INFORMATION RESOURCE AND BY PROVIDING MENTORING AND ADVICE TO THOSE SEEKING TO SET UP OR EXPAND A CHARITY, COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY OR OTHER FORM OF SOCIAL ENTERPRISE. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS: (I) A SOCIAL ENTERPRISE IS AN ORGANISATION WHICH OPERATES FOR ONE OF THE FOLLOWING SOCIAL PURPOSES: EDUCATION, HEALTHCARE, THE ARTS, SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH, POVERTY REDUCTION AND THE ENVIRONMENT; AND (II) SOCIAL INVESTMENT MEANS INVESTMENT IN A SOCIAL ENTERPRISE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEUK Shared Services 13-15 Dock St
Tower hamlets
London
E1 8JN
- Phone:
- 07738195504
- Email:
- andrew@expertimpact.com
- Website:
-
expertimpact.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window