Accounts and annual returns Pen Green supporting children and families in Corby

Charity number: 1157407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 17 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 17 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 21 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 16 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window