Financial history Pen Green supporting children and families in Corby

Charity number: 1157407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £321 £521 £1.12k £8.19k £6.09k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £268 £2.33k £2.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.60k N/A