Accounts and annual returns THE ROCK AND REDEEMER VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1156916
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 December 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 December 2021 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 February 2021 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 February 2021 96 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window