Financial history THE ROCK AND REDEEMER VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1156916
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £43.05k £57.56k £67.39k £109.67k £101.18k
Total expenditure £31.41k £46.43k £74.92k £80.34k £108.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A