ACTIVENEWHAM

Charity number: 1157266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAINE STANNARD Trustee 16 March 2016 None on record
Bob Heaton Trustee 15 March 2017 None on record
TIMOTHY JOHN DAVIES Chair 17 September 2014 None on record
Sion Padrig O'Connor Trustee 15 March 2017 None on record
Nilufa Jahan Trustee 26 May 2021 None on record
Genevieve Kitchen Trustee 27 March 2019 None on record