Accounts and annual returns TRINITY & ST. MICHAEL'S SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1155595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 November 2018 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required