THE FONTMELL MAGNA PUBLIC AMENITY SITE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to preserve for public use amenity sites in the village of Fontmell Magna, Dorset
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 11 March 2014: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Adlam | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SANDIE SAUNDERS | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Maitland Forfar | Trustee | 18 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD STAINER | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £2.63k | £850 | £8 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £832 | £1.04k | £441 | £3.58k | £337 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC AMENITY SITES IN THE PARISH OF FONTMELL MAGNA FOR THE BENEFIT AND ENJOYMENT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FONTMELL MAGNA AND OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Mill Street
Fontmell Magna
Shaftesbury
SP7 0NU
- Phone:
- 01747811153
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window