SKILLS WORK AND ENTERPRISE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY LTD

Charity number: 1158859
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £267.38k £371.53k £343.60k £335.95k £338.88k
Total expenditure £311.35k £302.03k £353.64k £370.31k £335.36k
Income from government contracts £87.87k £344.38k £289.11k £120.01k £119.66k
Income from government grants £96.35k £0 N/A N/A N/A