THE NOOR FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1155934
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 March 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 03 August 2017 184 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 23 March 2016 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 31 March 2016 60 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)