Financial history THE NOOR FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1155934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £108.51k £82.12k £86.65k £90.42k £98.80k
Total expenditure £162.42k £79.61k £54.78k £79.30k £73.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A