THE JOANNA WILDLIFE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1158047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 June 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 September 2019 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time Download