THE JOANNA WILDLIFE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1158047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £203.37k £4.52k £4.99k £5.71k £6.30k
Total expenditure £10.81k £4.64k £2.90k £652 £20.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A