Financial history WORKSOP AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1156668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.09k £24.77k £28.88k £25.52k £3.27k
Total expenditure £4.07k £21.49k £24.49k £23.52k £3.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A