HOME-START ST. HELENS LTD.

Charity number: 1155988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 September 2017 On time Download