Accounts and annual returns CARDIFF DEAF CENTRE

Charity number: 1156719
Charity reporting is overdue by 146 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 May 2019 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 May 2019 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 April 2018 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 April 2018 65 days late Download Open in new window