RYEDALE COMMUNITY AND LEISURE CENTRE

Charity number: 1158337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £57.55k £64.17k £55.25k £70.78k £69.73k
Total expenditure £33.35k £31.81k £32.23k £38.86k £53.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £863 £882