THE BELIEVE AND ACHIEVE TRUST

Charity number: 1157173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cory Mellor Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Phillip Clayton Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
Mark Storie Trustee 15 October 2019 None on record
EMMA TOONE Trustee 07 March 2014
CURZON ASHTON COMMUNITY FOUNDATION Received: On time
WAYNE WILLIAMS Trustee 07 March 2014 None on record
Matthew Newbury Trustee 10 October 2017 None on record
Leigh Drennan Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Ian Ainscough Trustee 18 May 2016 None on record