Accounts and annual returns GARW VALLEY LINKS

Charity number: 1157736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window