THE CO-MISSION INITIATIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1157383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £650.22k £279.33k £1.30m £1.14m £917.40k
Total expenditure £506.56k £357.79k £948.53k £1.30m £924.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £649.61k N/A £1.08m £905.99k £869.75k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £610 N/A £216.19k £202.76k £47.17k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £190 £479
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £27.17k £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £506.56k N/A £948.53k £1.30m £924.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.35k N/A £5.86k £18.90k £9.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £158.06k £84.72k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0