EMPOWERING COMMUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises money from the public by donations and collections and uses these donations to fund projects in Pakistan and India to provide shelters,water pump projects, medical camps and food and financial aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bangladesh
- Central African Republic
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- India
- Pakistan
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
Governance
- 26 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
USMAN SHEIKH | Chair | 26 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
AWAIS AHMAD CHAUDHRY | Trustee | 25 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
IRAM MEHNAZ KHAN | Trustee | 26 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £263.68k | £226.86k | £186.50k | £92.41k | £91.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £274.55k | £220.64k | £180.75k | £107.38k | £98.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £49.62k | £85.92k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 January 2023 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 January 2023 | 210 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR ANY OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS AFFECTED BY SUCH DISASTERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Empowering Communities
337 Great Horton Road
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD7 3BU
- Phone:
- 01274 502750
- Website:
-
empoweringcommunities.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window