Trustees WASHINGTON MIND CIO

Charity number: 1156010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BERNADETTE CORNISH Chair 04 March 2014
None on record
Molly Mcilvaney Trustee 22 December 2020
None on record
Richard Jackson Trustee 10 October 2019
None on record
Lesley Thompson Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
Elaine Habron Trustee 25 September 2015
None on record
David Wright Trustee 04 March 2014
None on record
DIANNE SNOWDON COUNCILLOR Trustee 04 March 2014
None on record