PENKETH YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504457
Charity reporting is overdue by 855 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £1.36k £1.35k £1.37k £1.19k £1.22k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £700
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A