MARKET HARBOROUGH AND THE BOWDENS CHARITY

Charity number: 1157787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEOFF BUXTON Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
GORDON KELLIE Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Professor William Jones Trustee 09 July 2014
UNIVERSITIES ASSOCIATION FOR LIFELONG LEARNING Received: On time
GUY HARTOPP Trustee 09 July 2014 None on record
JENNIFER ANN BALME Trustee 22 February 2018 None on record
Norman Proudfoot Trustee 25 July 2015 None on record
SARAH HILL Trustee 30 May 2019
ARTS FRESCO LTD Received: 5 days late
HOWARD WATSON SYMINGTON MEMORIAL CHARITY Received: On time
LEONORA ANNE RHODES Trustee 09 July 2014 None on record
JANICE HEFFORD Trustee 09 July 2014 None on record
KERRY MERRYWEATHER Trustee 30 May 2019 None on record
Joanne Adkins Trustee 25 July 2015 None on record
JOHN FEAVYOUR QPM Trustee 25 November 2014
HARBOROUGH COMMUNITY BUS Received: On time
HOWARD WATSON SYMINGTON MEMORIAL CHARITY Received: On time
ADAM MUGRIDGE MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
LINDA KVATCH Trustee 29 August 2019 None on record
JOAN WILLIAMS Trustee 09 July 2014 None on record
ADRIAN TROTTER Chair 09 July 2014 None on record
Dr JULIE JONES Trustee 09 July 2014 None on record