Financial history MORECAMBE F.C. COMMUNITY SPORTS

Charity number: 1155802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £178.80k £207.57k £218.70k £205.79k £284.11k
Total expenditure £168.81k £204.35k £219.26k £183.44k £247.27k
Income from government contracts £24.07k £41.39k N/A £18.98k £17.02k
Income from government grants £1.00k £1.00k £12.44k £7.00k £65.11k