Trustees VULTURE CLUB
Charity number: 1157909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Browne | Chair | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Alvar Hemming | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annie Wilson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Messenger | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Judd | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE WILLMAN | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.