Accounts and annual returns SALTASH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 July 2019 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required