Accounts and annual returns THE HISTORIC TOWNS TRUST

Charity number: 1160040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 02 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 03 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 25 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 25 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2016 14 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 14 February 2017 On time Download Open in new window