Financial history THE HISTORIC TOWNS TRUST

Charity number: 1160040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £33.20k £18.39k £58.05k £45.80k £30.26k
Total expenditure £36.18k £22.87k £52.54k £40.94k £35.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A