BOROUGHLEA LIMITED

Charity number: 1155630
Charity reporting is up to date (84 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £321.00k £176.00k £180.00k £287.80k £100.00k
Total expenditure £493.19k £214.77k £164.81k £79.22k £322.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A