Accounts and annual returns ST JOSEPH'S PRE-SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 1159694
Charity reporting is overdue by 1341 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 245 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 12 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 610 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 610 days
Annual return 04 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 976 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 976 days
Annual return 04 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1341 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1341 days
Annual return 04 April 2017 26 March 2018 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 26 March 2018 50 days late Download Open in new window