ALAM BAKS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1158586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 01 January 2020 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 25 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 25 December 2017 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required