Financial history ELEMENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1157932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £352.85k £427.57k £535.05k £277.11k £435.96k
Total expenditure £344.99k £434.02k £458.64k £244.38k £343.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k £34.46k £20.71k £19.60k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £66.18k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £16.76k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £452.01k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £94 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £458.64k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A