THE RALPH VAUGHAN WILLIAMS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1156614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £56.96k £74.19k £86.68k £66.14k £67.07k
Total expenditure £56.77k £69.29k £62.19k £57.98k £77.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A