Trustees THE RALPH VAUGHAN WILLIAMS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1156614

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON COOMBS | Chair | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Green | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Riley | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Aston | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Evan Grames | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gaye Hadley | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Robert Harold Pearson | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN VANN ARAM FRCO | Trustee | 17 January 2015 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM HEDLEY | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TREADWAY | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MUNCY | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK RICHARD HAMMETT | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Martin Charles Murray | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANCIS | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.