Bethel Reformed Baptist Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Bible believing and teaching Church in Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire in England. Our activities include Preaching, Singing Psalms and Hymns. Teaching adults and Children about the Good News of Salvation found only in the Lord Jesus Christ. We have a monthly Gospel Youth Rally as well as a weekly Sunday School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 March 2014: Standard registration
- BENNETTS END REFORMED BAPTIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR Chalan Hetherington | Chair | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAHILRAJAH HENRY | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.93k | £37.74k | £43.61k | £43.12k | £42.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.99k | £25.78k | £31.71k | £33.35k | £34.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/02/2014 as amended on 13 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO BAPTIST PRINCIPLES AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Barnfield
Hemel Hempstead
HP3 9QH
- Phone:
- 01442403099
- Email:
- bethelsbc@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window