OXFORD CHURCHES DEBT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Several Oxford churches together share the responsibility of running a debt help centre on behalf of Christians Against Poverty. We help people who are in debt, to work their way out of debt. We are Christians but work with people of any faith or none.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 February 2014: CIO registration
- 12 February 2025: Funds received from 238259 CRITCHLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
- CAP Oxford (Central) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Mary Bishop | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW SAMUEL PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|||||
James Bloice Smith | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jenni Williams | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DUNCAN PRICE | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.37k | £97.30k | £81.62k | £75.36k | £86.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.24k | £70.17k | £84.98k | £84.82k | £81.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Feb 2014 as amended on 23 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
(A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PERSONS LIVING IN AND AROUND OXFORD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK IT;(B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC LIVING IN AND AROUND OXFORD IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR PERSONAL FINANCES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT;(C)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH CARE,COMPASSION AND RELEVANT PRACTICAL AND SPIRITUAL HELP AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Trinity Street
OXFORD
OX1 1TY
- Phone:
- 07801448929
- Email:
- oxchdc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window